Global Patent Index - EP 1055466 A2

EP 1055466 A2 2000-11-29 - Hydraulic drive unit for an assembling tool

Title (en)

Hydraulic drive unit for an assembling tool

Title (de)

Hydraulische Antriebseinrichtung für ein Fügewerkzeug

Title (fr)

Système d'entraînement hydraulique pour une machine d'assemblage

Publication

EP 1055466 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110295 A

Priority

DE 19924310 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic unit has a holding down device drive (20) with a piston-cylinder-unit, which is carried by the piston rod (8) the plunger drive (2). The pressure chamber (32) of the drive is connected to the second working chamber of the plunger drive vi flow connection (34). To generate holding-down force, pressure from the second working chamber (14) of the plunger drive is transferred to the pressure chamber of the holding down device drive.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine hydraulische Antriebseinrichtung für ein Werkzeug zum Fügen mindestens zweier Werkstücke aus duktilem Material wie z.B. zum Stanznieten oder Durchsetzfügen. Die Antriebseinrichtung besteht aus einem Stempelantrieb zum Betätigen eines Stempels für den Fügevorgang und einem Niederhalterantrieb zum Betätigen eines die Werkstücke während des Fügevorgangs einspannenden Niederhalters. Beide Antriebe sind als Kolben-Zylinder-Einheit ausgebildet. Die Kolben-Zylinder-Einheit des Niederhalterantriebs wird von der Kolbenstange des Stempelantriebs getragen. Ferner ist die Druckkammer des Niederhalterantriebs mit der einen Arbeitskammer des Stempelantriebs so verbunden, daß zum Erzeugen der Niederhaltekraft Druck in der Arbeitskammer des Stempelantriebs auf die Druckkammer des Niederhalterantriebes übertragen wird. Somit sind nur zwei Anschlüsse zur Druckversorgung beider Antriebe erforderlich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/031 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49837 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5307 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5377 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055466 A2 20001129; EP 1055466 A3 20020724; EP 1055466 B1 20040721; DE 19924310 A1 20001130; DE 19924310 B4 20071122; ES 2224962 T3 20050316; US 6398096 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060524

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060523

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060523

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-05-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050524

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224962 T3

2004-11-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007105 P 20040826

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 39/03 A, 7B 21J 15/20 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI