Global Patent Index - EP 1055487 A1

EP 1055487 A1 2000-11-29 - Pliers with parallel jaws

Title (en)

Pliers with parallel jaws

Title (de)

Zange mit parallelen Backen

Title (fr)

Pince avec machoires paralleles

Publication

EP 1055487 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101949 A

Priority

DE 19923998 A

Abstract (en)

The wrench has two parallel working jaws (3, 7) and two handles (1, 16) able to turn relative to each other, each firming a unit, pivoted to each other via a drive device, so that when the handles are turned, the working jaws move towards or away from each other. The second working jaw is on a slide (8) which can move on a rail (2) connected to the first working jaw.

Abstract (de)

Eine Zange gemäß der Erfindung enthält zwei parallele Arbeitsbacken (3, 7) und zwei relativ zueinander verschwenkbare Handgriffe (1, 16), von denen einer (1) zur Bildung einer ersten Zangeneinheit (Z1) mit einem ersten (3) der Arbeitsbacken fest und ein anderer (16) zur Bildung einer zweiten Zangeneinheit (Z2) mit einem zweiten (7) der Arbeitsbacken über eine Antriebsvorrichtung (14) gelenkig verbunden sind, um bei Verschwenken der Handgriffe (1, 16) die Arbeitsbacken (3, 7) in einer Arbeitsrichtung (A) aufeinander zu oder voneinander weg zu bewegen, wobei eine Ruheposition der zweiten Zangeneinheit (Z2) relativ zur ersten Zangeneinheit (Z1) in Arbeitsrichtung (A) voreinstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/12; B21J 15/38; B25B 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/10 (2006.01); B25B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/10 (2013.01); B25B 7/12 (2013.01); B25B 7/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055487 A1 20001129; DE 19923998 A1 20001207; TW 397742 B 20000711; US 6314843 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE GMBH & CO.

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI