Global Patent Index - EP 1055489 A2

EP 1055489 A2 2000-11-29 - Process for determining the operational life and state of a hydraulic impact assembly

Title (en)

Process for determining the operational life and state of a hydraulic impact assembly

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ermittlung der Betriebsdauer und des Einsatz-Zustands eines hydraulischen Schlagaggregats

Title (fr)

Procédé de determination de temps d'utilisation et état d'un ensemble de percussion

Publication

EP 1055489 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109684 A

Priority

DE 19923680 A

Abstract (en)

The determination method is carried out, so that during the individual, timely successive operational sections of the hydrau impact set, signals are produced. The number of which is proportional to the strokes carried out by the percussion pistons in a movement direction. The number of signals is continuously totalled up and is stored as a total figure. The respective actual tot number of the signals is made identifiable at least intermittently in the form of an indication concerning the application condition.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der Betriebsdauer und des Einsatz-Zustands eines hydraulischen Schlagaggregats, insbesondere Hydraulikhammer (3), mit einem Schlagkolben (8), der - in einem Gehäuse (3a) geführt wird - unter Einwirkung einer Steuerung (9) wechselweise einen Arbeitshub in Schlagrichtung (Pfeil 8e) und einen Rückhub ausführt. Mit der Erfindung sollen Maßnahmen und Mittel angegeben werden, aufgrund derer sich Informationen im Hinblick auf die Entscheidung gewinnen lassen, ob für das Schlagaggregat bereits Wartungsbedarf besteht oder ob dieses weiterhin eingesetzt werden kann. Zu diesem Zweck werden während der einzelnen zeitlich aufeinanderfolgenden Betriebsabschnitte des Schlagaggregats (3) Signale erzeugt, deren Anzahl zu den vom Schlagkolben (8) in einer Bewegungsrichtung ausgeführten Hüben proportional ist. Die Anzahl dieser Signale wird fortlaufend aufsummiert und als Gesamtzahl gespeichert mit der Möglichkeit, die jeweils aktuelle Gesamtzahl der Signale zumindest zeitweilig in Form einer auf den Einsatz-Zustand hinweisenden Anzeige erkennbar zu machen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/00 (2006.01); B02C 1/00 (2006.01); B25D 9/26 (2006.01); E02F 3/96 (2006.01); E04G 23/08 (2006.01); E21B 1/26 (2006.01); E21C 37/24 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/966 (2013.01); E04G 23/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3443542 C2 19900726

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923680 A1 20001123; DE 19923680 B4 20040226; AT 375848 T 20071115; DE 50014717 D1 20071129; EP 1055489 A2 20001129; EP 1055489 A3 20040204; EP 1055489 B1 20071017; ES 2293876 T3 20080401; JP 2001017873 A 20010123; US 6510902 B1 20030128

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

- Free text: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH#HELENENSTRASSE 149#45143 ESSEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH#HELENENSTRASSE 149#45143 ESSEN (DE)

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080118

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080317

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2293876 T3

2007-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RENTSCH & PARTNER

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014717 P 20071129

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-11-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071017

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR DETERMINING THE OPERATIONAL LIFE AND STATE OF A HYDRAULIC IMPACT ASSEMBLY

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI