Global patent index - EP 1055524 A1

EP 1055524 A1 2000-11-29 - Process for decorating metals

Title (en)

Process for decorating metals

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Dekorieren von Metall

Title (fr)

Procédé pour décorer des pièces métalliques

Publication

EP 1055524 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00106868 A

Priority

IT BA990012 A

Abstract (en)

A process for the decoration of metals, metal alloys, in the form of extruded profiles, sheets and metal articles in general, that utilizes the transfer system. The process allows the decoration, with one only treatment, of metal extruded profiles on the four faces, independently on the shape of the profile, using suction and compressed air. The new process causes transfer to be quicker and provides an optimum result with respect to the quality of the final product. After the preliminary steps of pickling and painting, obtained by using colorless paints, the profile is wrapped up in a paper bag bearing on the surface the color and the pattern to be transferred. Air is removed from this bag. To correct paper adhesion to the support, compressed air is utilized and lastly heating. Only compressed air is utilized for sheet decoration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 1/17; B41M 5/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B41M 1/28 (2006.01); B41M 5/035 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/035 (2013.01); B05D 5/06 (2013.01); B41M 1/28 (2013.01); B41M 5/0351 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055524 A1 20001129; EP 1055524 B1 20040602; AT 268269 T 20040615; DE 60011185 D1 20040708; DE 60011185 T2 20050728; ES 2218020 T3 20041116; IT 1307891 B1 20011119; IT BA990012 A1 20001009

INPADOC legal status

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120330

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080330

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071003

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-03-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060309

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-03-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2218020

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040402554

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60011185

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GR IT

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021111

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GR IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GR IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI