Global Patent Index - EP 1055579 A1

EP 1055579 A1 2000-11-29 - Wagon with an operating device for slidable walls or hoods

Title (en)

Wagon with an operating device for slidable walls or hoods

Title (de)

Güterwagen mit einer Betätigungseinrichtung für verschiebbare Wände oder Hauben

Title (fr)

Wagon avec un dispositif d'actionnement pour parois ou capots coulissants

Publication

EP 1055579 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250165 A

Priority

EP 99250165 A

Abstract (en)

The hand lever (4) for operating the mechanism has a rotation axis (12) extending at an angle with respect to the horizontal which is equal to or greater than 90 degrees -arctane (h1/(l1 + l2)). The hand lever has a rear edge oriented towards one of the end walls, which is displaced in an outwards direction from the buffer engagement plane by a distance (r1) to maintain a safety distance (16) from the lever. Operating mechanism where h1 is the height of the shunting handle (17) above a left end step (18) of a corner column in the length direction, l1 is the distance from the middle shunting handle grip surface to the intersection point of the hand lever rotation axis with the buffer engagement plane or outside of a car end wall (3), and l2 is the distance from the middle hand lev grip surface to the previously mentioned intersection point.

Abstract (de)

Betätigungseinrichtung, insbesondere für Güterwagen mit verschiebbaren Wänden oder Hauben, die durch ihre besondere Bauart die nötigen freizuhaltenden Räume an der Stirnwand nicht verletzt und eine einfache und sichere Bedienung ermöglicht. Ein Handhebel (4) ist auf einer Drehachse (12) mit einem in horizontaler Ebene liegenden Winkel (α) angeordnet, der der Beziehung α>=90°-arctan [h1/ (l1+l2)] folgt, wobei (h1) der Höhe eines Rangiergriffes (17) über einem linken Endtritt (18) an einer Ecksäule (19) in Wagenlängsrichtung und (l1) dem Abstand Mittelachse der Griffläche des Rangiergriffes (17) zu Schnittpunkt Drehachse (12) und (l2) dem Abstand Schnittpunkt Drehachse (12) mit der Pufferbefestigungsebene zu Mitte Griffläche des Handhebels (4) entspricht. Der Handhebel (4) ist in Wagenlängsrichtung mit seiner Hinterkante mindestens um ein Maß (r1) von der Pufferbefestigungsebene nach außen versetzt. (r1) stellt einen Sicherheitsabstand (16) dar. Eine Drehachse (13) ist in einem Winkel (β) und eine Drehachse (14) ist in einem Winkel (τ) zur Drehachse (12) angeordnet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055579 A1 20001129; EP 1055579 B1 20041208

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041208

2005-03-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB IT SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDIN

2004-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WAGON WITH AN OPERATING DEVICE FOR SLIDABLE WALLS OR HOODS

2003-11-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WAGON WITH AN OPERATING DEVICE FOR SLIDABLE WALLS OR HOODS

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FI FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI