Global Patent Index - EP 1055598 A2

EP 1055598 A2 2000-11-29 - On-deck container lashing equipment

Title (en)

On-deck container lashing equipment

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Laschen von Deckscontainern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour arrimer des conteneurs sur le pont d'un navire

Publication

EP 1055598 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110294 A

Priority

JP 14504999 A

Abstract (en)

One end (upper end) of a tightening member consisting of a lashing rod (6) and a turnbuckle (7) is attached to a lashing eye plate (4) on a lashing bridge pillar (8) erected on the deck of a ship, the tightening member extends slantwise downward, and the other end (lower end) thereof is attached to a corner metal (5) of a container (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 25/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 25/22 (2006.01); B63B 25/00 (2006.01); B63B 25/24 (2006.01); B63B 25/28 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 25/28 (2013.01); B63B 25/004 (2013.01); B65D 2590/0016 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055598 A2 20001129; EP 1055598 A3 20020821; EP 1055598 B1 20060419; DE 60027349 D1 20060524; DE 60027349 T2 20060831; DK 1055598 T3 20060814; JP 2000335480 A 20001205; JP 4015318 B2 20071128; KR 100462927 B1 20041223; KR 20010049384 A 20010615

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070122

2006-08-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027349 P 20060524

2006-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI