Global patent index - EP 1055605 A2

EP 1055605 A2 2000-11-29 - Packaging and transport container for garment hangers

Title (en)

Packaging and transport container for garment hangers

Title (de)

Verpackungs- und/oder Transportbehältnis für Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Récipient d'emballage et de transport pour cintres

Publication

EP 1055605 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110463 A

Priority

DE 19924580 A

Abstract (en)

The container consists of a cubic box (1), which may be foldable. A dividing board (3) runs diagonally to the bottom surface is fitted partly non-positively so that it divides the cavity into two identical part cavities with triangular base surface, improving the stability of the box over its cavity diagonal.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verpackungs- und/oder Transportbehältnis für Kleiderbügel, bestehend aus einer ggf. faltbaren kubischen Box, gemäß Oberbegriff des Patentanspruches 1. Um hierbei zu erreichen, daß , ein Verpackungs- und/oder Transportbehältnis für Kleiderbügel dahingehend zu optimieren, daß die Kleiderbügel zum einen sehr schnell verpackbar sind, durch ein sich selbst ordnendes Hineinwerfen in das Behältnis, und zum anderen eine raumoptimierte Verpackung einer Vielzahl von Kleiderbügel möglich ist, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß zur raumoptimierten Verpackung einer Vielzahl von Kleiderbügeln in die Box (1) eine zur Bodenfläche diagonal verlaufende Trennplatte (3) derart teilformschlüssig eingebracht ist, daß sie den Innenraum in zwei Teilräume mit dreieckiger Grundfläche teilt und die Box zusätzlich über ihre Raumdiagonale stabilisiert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/499; B65D 25/04; B65D 85/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/49 (2006.01); B65D 25/04 (2006.01); B65D 85/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/04 (2013.01); B65D 5/48046 (2013.01); B65D 85/62 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055605 A2 20001129; EP 1055605 A3 20020109; DE 19924580 A1 20001207

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI