Global Patent Index - EP 1055606 A3

EP 1055606 A3 2002-11-13 - Carton package

Title (en)

Carton package

Title (de)

Verpackung aus Karton

Title (fr)

Emballage en carton

Publication

EP 1055606 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00109501 A

Priority

DE 29909008 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1055606A2] A pouch-like carton (30) has a base (3), a top (2) and two sidewalls (4,5). The carton is formed by a combination of bending The free ends of the top and bottom are joined by an overlapping glued joint. The top incorporates an opening flap which extends int the overlapping glued joint.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/70; B65D 5/02; B65D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/06 (2006.01); B65D 5/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/70 (2013.01); B65D 5/02 (2013.01); B65D 5/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909008 U1 19990909; EP 1055606 A2 20001129; EP 1055606 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 5/70 A, 7B 65D 5/02 B, 7B 65D 5/06 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI