Global Patent Index - EP 1055607 A2

EP 1055607 A2 2000-11-29 - Container lid

Title (en)

Container lid

Title (de)

Behälterdeckel

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour récipient

Publication

EP 1055607 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304197 A

Priority

JP 13702499 A

Abstract (en)

To suppress flapping in container lids having a (synthetic polymer) resin layer. The container lid (1) in being attached to the opening in container body (2) is of resin in at least a layer, and is provided with a panel (5), a seal-opening grip (12), a flange (6) and a score (7). The panel (5) is for covering the opening in the container body (2). One end of the grip (12), which is furnished on the top of the panel (5), is fixed edge-ward on one part of the panel (5). The flange (6) is formed on the outer periphery of the panel (5), and is fitted to the brim of the container body (2) opening. The score (7) consists of an annular groove formed between the panel (5) and the flange (6). On its rear-half section, the panel (5) then has bending portion(s) by slit(s) (5b) that when opening the seal are for bending back along fold lines that intersect with the seal-opening direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 17/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/28 (2006.01); B65D 17/40 (2006.01); B65D 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055607 A2 20001129; EP 1055607 A3 20010516; CA 2308730 A1 20001118; JP 2000326968 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020131

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI