Global Patent Index - EP 1055620 A1

EP 1055620 A1 2000-11-29 - Device for picking up and/or transporting flexible and flat products

Title (en)

Device for picking up and/or transporting flexible and flat products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ab-und/oder Weitertransportieren von flexiblen, flächigen Erzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour prélever et/ou transporter des produits flexibles et plats

Publication

EP 1055620 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110601 A

Priority

CH 99899 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a number of gripping devices (3) in sequence and movable along a gripper transport path and a number of suction elements (2) movable along a suction element transport path to a holder for each product (9) in an acquisition and trans region. The suction element transport path runs along or parallel to the gripper transport path in the acquisition and transfer region.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Ab- und/oder Weitertransportieren von flexiblen, flächigen Erzeugnissen, insbesondere Druckereierzeugnissen 9, mit einer Mehrzahl entlang einer Greifer-Förderstrecke bewegbaren, in Transportrichtung aufeinanderfolgenden Greifern 3 und einer Mehrzahl von entlang einer Saugorgan-Förderstrecke bewegbaren Saugorganen 2 zur in einem Aufnahme- und Übergabebereich erfolgenden Aufnahme jeweils eines Erzeugnisses 9 und zur Übergabe des aufgenommenen Erzeugnisses 9 an einen Greifer 3, wobei die Saugorgan-Förderstrecke im Aufnahme- und Übergabebereich entlang oder parallel zur Greifer-Förderstrecke verläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/42; B65H 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/42 (2006.01); B65H 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/6609 (2013.01); B65H 3/42 (2013.01); B65H 5/085 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4472 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4474 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/4474 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055620 A1 20001129; EP 1055620 B1 20041103; AT 281389 T 20041115; AU 3634600 A 20001130; AU 764208 B2 20030814; CA 2309239 A1 20001128; CA 2309239 C 20070717; DE 50008473 D1 20041209; DK 1055620 T3 20041206; ES 2226648 T3 20050401; JP 2000335760 A 20001205; JP 4921631 B2 20120425; RU 2260554 C2 20050920; US 6554268 B1 20030429

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160803

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226648 T3

2005-03-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008473 P 20041209

2004-12-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI