Global Patent Index - EP 1055624 A2

EP 1055624 A2 2000-11-29 - Device for winding a web

Title (en)

Device for winding a web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enrouler une bande

Publication

EP 1055624 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106537 A

Priority

DE 19923930 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a secondary transport mechanism (15) with a lifting device (27) that carries an air squeezing element (2 and its pressure device (26) and that is suitable for moving the air squeezing element and its pressure device to a distance fro the spool roll (11b) rotation axis corresp. to the current layer thickness (S1).

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln einer Papierbahn (9), auf einen Tambour (12), wobei eine Wickelrolle (11) gebildet wird. Eine Tragtrommel (10) bildet mit der Wickelrolle (11) einen Wickelspalt. Eine Sekundär-Transporteinrichtung (15) dient zum Verfahren des Tambours (12) entlang einer horizontalen Fahrbahn (13) und trägt eine Luftabquetschelement (25), das bei Erreichen einer gewünschten Schichtdicke mittels einer Andrückeinrichtung (26) an die Wickelrolle (11) andrückbar ist. An der Sekundär-Transporteinrichtung (15) ist eine Hubeinrichtung (27) vorgesehen, die das Luftabquetschelement (25) und dessen Andrückeinrichtung (26) trägt und die dazu geeignet ist, das Luftabquetschelement (25) und dessen Andrückeinrichtung (26) in einen der momentanen Schichtdicke (S1) entsprechenden Abstand von der Wickelrollen-Drehachse zu verfahren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 18/16 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2364 (2013.01); B65H 2601/211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055624 A2 20001129; EP 1055624 A3 20020206; EP 1055624 B1 20040616; AT 269263 T 20040715; DE 19923930 A1 20001130; US 6390408 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-09-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006796

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2004-06-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI