Global patent index - EP 1055626 A1

EP 1055626 A1 2000-11-29 - Method and device for diverting printed sheets

Title (en)

Method and device for diverting printed sheets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ablenken von Bedruckstoffbogen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour dévier des feuilles imprimées

Publication

EP 1055626 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109107 A

Priority

US 31763599 A

Abstract (en)

The signatures (A,108) are loaded by a second speed vector (142) in a second deflection sector and a second signature flow ( is loaded with a third speed vector (144) differing from vector (142), using drive (114) to contact flow (A) at a number of pre-set areas to provide the friction to load these with the second speed vector (142). A belt (106) in feed sector (102) feeds the interleaved flow of signatures (108) into the specified sector with the aid of a belt (12) equipped with clamping plates or projecting parts. The signatures are angled off relative the first speed vector in an angle sector in the second flow sector and signatures are angled in a second way on a delivery sector. Differences in spacing are corrected between the signatures in the f sector (102), and drive (114) includes a roll for signature contact. One or both belts (120,122) run at first and second angles relation to the first speed vector (104).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Ablenken und Vereinzeln von z. B. von einer Bahn abgeschnittenen Signaturen (108, A, B), in einer kostengünstigen, effizienten Weise, wobei die Gefahr von Beschädigungen der Signaturen (108, A, B) oder eines Staus in der Druckmaschine herabgesetzt ist. Ausführungsbeispiele zeigen die Verwirklichung der Ablenkung und Vereinzelung der Signaturen in einem einzigen Schritt, ohne dass die Signaturen umorientiert werden müssen. Wenn z. B. die Signaturen eine Falzkante aufweisen, kann die Orientierung dieser Falzkante durch den gesamten Ablenk- und Vereinzelungsprozess hindurch aufrechterhalten werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/60; B65H 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/56 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/6672 (2013.01); B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B65H 2301/341 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44472 (2013.01); B65H 2404/3132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055626 A1 20001129; EP 1055626 B1 20040317; DE 50005645 D1 20040422; JP 2001002302 A 20010109; US 6155562 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50005645

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120607

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-05-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060504

2005-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-11-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005645

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI