Global Patent Index - EP 1055627 A2

EP 1055627 A2 2000-11-29 - Device for stacking and transporting plastic bags, in particular bags for automatic machines

Title (en)

Device for stacking and transporting plastic bags, in particular bags for automatic machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Stapeln und Abtransportieren von Kunststoffbeuteln, insbesondere Automatenbeuteln

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour empiler et transporter des sacs plastiques, en particulier des sacs pour machines automatiques

Publication

EP 1055627 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111150 A

Priority

DE 19924625 A

Abstract (en)

Device for stacking and transporting plastic bags, especially automat bags, comprises a conveyor with a stacking chain (3) w carries a needle (4) as stacking component. A robot takes the bags off with a rod-shaped gripper (8) which has a stripping aid.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung zum Stapeln und Abtransportieren von Kunststoffbeuteln, insbesondere Automatenbeuteln, die zum Zwecke einer vereinfachten und präziseren Aufnahme und Übergabe von Beuteln bzw. Beutelstapeln als Nadeln ausgebildete Stapelelemente (4) und einer an einer Greifhand (8) eines Roboters (6) angeordnete, mit den Nadeln (4) der Fördereinrichtung (2) zusammenwirkende Abstreifhilfe (46, 47) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/98 (2006.01); B65H 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/3045 (2013.01); B31B 70/984 (2017.08); B65H 2301/42242 (2013.01); B65H 2404/3141 (2013.01); B65H 2701/191 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055627 A2 20001129; EP 1055627 A3 20020502; DE 19924625 A1 20001130; US 6457927 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI