Global patent index - EP 1055629 A2

EP 1055629 A2 2000-11-29 - Yarn supply system

Title (en)

Yarn supply system

Title (de)

Fadenliefersystem

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en fil textile

Publication

EP 1055629 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110457 A

Priority

SE 9901963 A

Abstract (en)

A yarn feeder stand supports several driven yarn feeder units (F) on transverse arms (T) carried on a hollow central column The current supply unit (P) is mounted within the column (A), with cable connectors (2,4) on the column or on an access cover. T column (A) also carries connections for other services, e.g. data transmission, compressed air.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Fadenliefersystem Y mit einem Liefergerät-Ständer S, der einen Fußteil 1, wenigstens eine vertikale Säule A und an der Säule angeordnete Tragarme T für wenigstens ein Faden-Liefergerät F aufweist, und mit wenigstens einer an das Netz anschließbaren Stromversorgungs-Einheit P ist die Stromversorgungs-Einheit P im Inneren der Säule A angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/32; B65H 51/22; D03D 47/36; D04B 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 51/32 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/48 (2013.01); B65H 51/22 (2013.01); B65H 51/32 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5305 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055629 A2 20001129; EP 1055629 A3 20010516; EP 1055629 B1 20030806; DE 50003161 D1 20030911; SE 9901963 D0 19990527

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE IT LI NL

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI