Global Patent Index - EP 1055629 A3

EP 1055629 A3 2001-05-16 - Yarn supply system

Title (en)

Yarn supply system

Title (de)

Fadenliefersystem

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en fil textile

Publication

EP 1055629 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00110457 A

Priority

SE 9901963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1055629A2] A yarn feeder stand supports several driven yarn feeder units (F) on transverse arms (T) carried on a hollow central column The current supply unit (P) is mounted within the column (A), with cable connectors (2,4) on the column or on an access cover. T column (A) also carries connections for other services, e.g. data transmission, compressed air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/32; B65H 51/22; D03D 47/36; D04B 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 51/32 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/48 (2013.01); B65H 51/22 (2013.01); B65H 51/32 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5305 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055629 A2 20001129; EP 1055629 A3 20010516; EP 1055629 B1 20030806; DE 50003161 D1 20030911; SE 9901963 D0 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003161 P 20030911

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE IT LI NL

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI