Global Patent Index - EP 1055630 A2

EP 1055630 A2 2000-11-29 - Method and apparatus for winding a yarn with a subsidiary winding on a bobbin

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for winding a yarn with a subsidiary winding on a bobbin

Title (de)

Verfahren und Aufwickelvorrichtung zum Aufwickeln eines Fadens mit einer Fadenreserve auf eine Spulenhülse

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour embobiner du fil textile avec une réserve de rattache

Publication

EP 1055630 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102531 A

Priority

DE 19923770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19923770C1] Yarn (F), especially folded yarn on a twister, is wound on a tube (4) by first winding a waste section containing insufficiently twisted yarn from the start-up. A transfer tail is then wound, starting near the package section and winding away from it. Finally the yarn is taken back over the tail to start winding the main package. An Independent claim is also included for a guiding arrangement (8) to divert the yarn (F) to form the claimed tail winding pattern. A sleeve fitted with two guide pegs (11,12) can be reciprocated and also rotated, preferably by hand, to bring either peg into action to wind the waste section or the transfer tail. The waste section is wound in a groove on the tube carrier disk and is cut off at doffing.

Abstract (de)

Bei diesem Verfahren zum Aufwickeln eines Fadens mit einer Fadenreserve auf eine Spulenhülse wird zu Beginn des Aufwickelns der Faden mittels einer Fadenleiteinrichtung außerhalb der eigentlichen Aufwickelzone der Spulenhülse geführt, um zunächst ein ungenügend verzwirntes Abfallfadenstück auf das eine Ende der Spulenhülse aufzuwickeln. Anschließend wird der Faden in einen der Aufwickelzone benachbarten Bereich geleitet und benachbart der Aufwickelzone mit dem Aufwickeln der Fadenreserve begonnen. Während des Aufwickelns der Fadenreserve wird der Faden allmählich von der Aufwickelzone weg zum Hülsenende hinbewegt, um hierdurch alle Fadenwindungen der Fadenreserve über das von der Abfallwicklung bis in die Nachbarschaft der Aufwickelzone verlaufende Fadenstück zu wickeln. Nach Bildung der Fadenreserve wird der Faden freigegeben, so daß er sich in Folge eines Schrägzuges zur Aufwickelzone bin kreuzend über die Fadenreserve legt, bevor er im Bereich der Aufwickelzone auf die Spulenhülse aufgewickelt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923770 C1 20000504; CN 1274772 A 20001129; EP 1055630 A2 20001129; EP 1055630 A3 20010530; EP 1055630 B1 20031029

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-06 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-06-06 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO.KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-06-06 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-06-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO.KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140505

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI