Global Patent Index - EP 1055630 A3

EP 1055630 A3 2001-05-30 - Method and apparatus for winding a yarn with a subsidiary winding on a bobbin

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for winding a yarn with a subsidiary winding on a bobbin

Title (de)

Verfahren und Aufwickelvorrichtung zum Aufwickeln eines Fadens mit einer Fadenreserve auf eine Spulenhülse

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour embobiner du fil textile avec une réserve de rattache

Publication

EP 1055630 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102531 A

Priority

DE 19923770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19923770C1] Yarn (F), especially folded yarn on a twister, is wound on a tube (4) by first winding a waste section containing insufficiently twisted yarn from the start-up. A transfer tail is then wound, starting near the package section and winding away from it. Finally the yarn is taken back over the tail to start winding the main package. An Independent claim is also included for a guiding arrangement (8) to divert the yarn (F) to form the claimed tail winding pattern. A sleeve fitted with two guide pegs (11,12) can be reciprocated and also rotated, preferably by hand, to bring either peg into action to wind the waste section or the transfer tail. The waste section is wound in a groove on the tube carrier disk and is cut off at doffing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923770 C1 20000504; CN 1274772 A 20001129; EP 1055630 A2 20001129; EP 1055630 A3 20010530; EP 1055630 B1 20031029

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170207

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-12-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171031

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-06 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-06-06 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO.KG, DE

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-06-06 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-06-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO.KG, DE

- Effective date: 20140505

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI