Global Patent Index - EP 1055631 A2

EP 1055631 A2 2000-11-29 - Bobbin creel

Title (en)

Bobbin creel

Title (de)

Spulenrahmen

Title (fr)

Cadre de bobine

Publication

EP 1055631 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110858 A

Priority

DE 19924390 A

Abstract (en)

The swing arms (2) holding the bobbin on a wind-up rotate about pivots (6) and are fitted with a guide rod (7). Their motion damped by braking surfaces acting at right angles to the guide rod axis and carried in a rotating housing (10) attached to the machine frame (32). The braking surfaces can be spring or pneumatically loaded and can have a pneumatic release piston.

Abstract (de)

Ein Spulenrahmen (1), der verschwenkbar an einem Maschinengestell (2) anbringbar ist und zur Halterung eines mit einem Filament zu bewickelnden, rotatorisch angetriebenen Spulenkörper (A) dient, ist gekennzeichnet durch mindestens eine an dem Spulenrahmen (1) angreifende Dämpfungseinrichtung, die während der ordnungsgemäßen Bewicklung des Spulenkörpers (A) ungeordneten Schwenkbewegungen des Spulenrahmens entgegenwirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/20 (2006.01); B65H 54/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/52 (2013.01); B65H 2601/524 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055631 A2 20001129; EP 1055631 A3 20020703; EP 1055631 B1 20040915; CN 1217840 C 20050907; CN 1275521 A 20001206; DE 19924390 A1 20001130; HK 1032775 A1 20060421; JP 2000355461 A 20001226; TR 200001528 A2 20001221; US 6484963 B1 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2005-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-03-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007729

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI