Global Patent Index - EP 1055632 A2

EP 1055632 A2 2000-11-29 - Method for the identification of the spinning units on cops

Title (en)

Method for the identification of the spinning units on cops

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Identifikation der Spinnstellen von Kops

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'identification des postes de filature sur canettes

Publication

EP 1055632 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109697 A

Priority

CH 96899 A

Abstract (en)

A reel (8) used in a yarn spinning process has tapered ends with a parallel section having a printed bar code (9). The code is contains all relative parameters of the yarn and is read optically.

Abstract (de)

In einem Verfahren zur Identifikation der Spinnstellen von Kops wird jeder Kops mit einer individuellen Markierung versehen, mit welcher die jeweilige Spinnstelle identifiziert werden kann. Die Markierung wird im Bereich der Umspulstationen ausgelesen um die jeweilige Spinnstelle festzustellen. Sie kann z.B. aus einem Strichcode (9) bestehen, der auf ein Ende der Spinnhülse (7) aufgebracht wird. Mit diesem System wird es in einfacher Weise möglich, in der Umspulmaschine gemessene Garnparameter den jeweiligen Spinnstellen zuzuordnen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06; B65H 75/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/02 (2006.01); B65H 49/00 (2006.01); B65H 55/00 (2006.01); B65H 63/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01); B65H 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/063 (2013.01); B65H 75/182 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055632 A2 20001129; EP 1055632 A3 20010627; JP 2000344419 A 20001212; US 6352214 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011228

2002-04-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI