Global patent index - EP 1055642 A2

EP 1055642 A2 2000-11-29 - Metal oxide doped cerium oxides, method for the preparation thereof, resin composition and cosmetic composition therewith

Title (en)

Metal oxide doped cerium oxides, method for the preparation thereof, resin composition and cosmetic composition therewith

Title (de)

Ceriumoxiddotiertes Metalloxid, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und diese Oxide enthaltende Kunststoff- und kosmetische Zusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Oxide metallique dopé avec d'oxide de cerium, procede pour leurs productions et compositions de resins et cosmetiques contenant ces oxides

Publication

EP 1055642 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102288 A

Priority

JP 14466499 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to the metal oxide doped cerium oxide which has an excellent ultraviolet ray shielding effect and a transparency and whose catalytic activity is reduced. More in detail, relates to the metal oxide doped cerium oxide composed of cerium oxide in which metal ion having larger ion radius than that of Ce<4+> and/or lower valence metal ion than Ce<4+>, such as Ca<2+>, Y<3+>, La<3+>, Nd<3+>, Eu<3+>, Tb<3+>, Sm<3+>, Mg<2+>, Sr<2+>, Ba<2+>, Ce<3+> and so on are doped. Said metal oxide doped cerium oxide can be prepared at the temperature lower than 60 DEG C and in the condition of pH higher than 5 by reacting aqueous solution of cerium salt, aqueous solution of metal ion having larger ion radius than that of Ce<4+> and/or lower valence metal ion than Ce<4+> and alkali, then adding oxidizing agent. Further, said metal oxide doped cerium oxide can be blended to resin composition or cosmetic composition and can display and ultraviolet shielding effect without spoiling transparency at visible ray region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01F 17/00; A61K 7/42; C08K 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01F 17/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/19 (2006.01); A61K 8/25 (2006.01); A61K 8/26 (2006.01); A61K 8/29 (2006.01); A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61Q 1/00 (2006.01); A61Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61Q 1/04 (2006.01); A61Q 1/06 (2006.01); A61Q 1/12 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); C08K 3/22 (2006.01); C08K 3/26 (2006.01); C08K 9/02 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); C09C 1/00 (2006.01); C09C 3/06 (2006.01); C09K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/19 (2013.01); A61Q 1/02 (2013.01); A61Q 1/06 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); C01F 17/0018 (2013.01); C01F 17/0043 (2013.01); C08K 9/02 (2013.01); C09C 1/00 (2013.01); C01P 2002/52 (2013.01); C01P 2002/72 (2013.01); C01P 2002/84 (2013.01); C01P 2004/64 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/40 (2013.01); C01P 2006/60 (2013.01); C01P 2006/90 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2991 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2993 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2998 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055642 A2 20001129; EP 1055642 A3 20011212; EP 1055642 B1 20060809; CN 1274682 A 20001129; CN 1308240 C 20070404; DE 60029870 D1 20060921; DE 60029870 T2 20070208; DE 60029870 T8 20070516; JP 2000327328 A 20001128; JP 3992402 B2 20071017; KR 100569083 B1 20060410; KR 20000075438 A 20001215; TW 528731 B 20030421; US 2005074384 A1 20050407; US 6589496 B1 20030708; US 6623858 B1 20030923

INPADOC legal status

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130217

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60029870

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130217

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-06-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-06-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KOSE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-06-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DAITO KASEI KOGYO CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60029870

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C01F 17/00 20060101AFI20060627BHEP

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C08K 3/22 20060101ALI20060627BHEP

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/00 20060101ALI20060627BHEP

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C09C 1/00 20060101ALI20060627BHEP

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050517

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOSE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIPPON DENKO CO.,LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 01F 17/00 A, 7C 08K 3/22 B, 7A 61K 7/42 B, 7C 09C 1/00 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI