Global patent index - EP 1055690 A1

EP 1055690 A1 2000-11-29 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED PHENOLIC RESIN

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED PHENOLIC RESIN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MODIFIZIERTEN PHENOLHARZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE RESINE PHENOLIQUE MODIFIEE

Publication

EP 1055690 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99973298 A

Priority

  • JP 9905450 W
  • JP 35157798 A

Abstract (en)

A process for producing a modified phenolic resin, comprising heating a heavy oil or pitch of given average molecular weight and, per mol, calculated from the average molecular weight, of the heavy oil or pitch; 0.3 to 25 mol, in terms of formaldehyde, a formaldehyde compound and 0.5 to 50 mol of a phenol of the formula (I) (wherein R<1> represents a linear or branched unsaturated hydrocarbon group having 1 to 2 unsaturated bonds and having 2 to 10 carbon atoms, p is 1 or 2, X represents an alkyl group having 1 to 5 carbon atoms, and q is 0 or 1) under stirring in the presence of an acid catalyst to thereby effect a polycondensation. The modified phenolic resin obtained by this process, as compared with the conventional modified phenolic resin produced from a heavy oil or pitch as a feedstock, has an extremely low softening point so as to be flowable at about room temperature and has also a low melt viscosity, thereby ensuring very excellent moldability. Further, in combination with an epoxy resin, the modified phenolic resin can be formed into a molded article which is excellent in not only heat resistance, moisture resistance, corrosion resistance and adhesive force but also mechanical properties such as dimensional stability and strength.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 8/28; C08G 10/04; C08G 14/04; C08G 16/04; C08G 59/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 8/28 (2006.01); C08G 10/04 (2006.01); C08G 14/04 (2006.01); C08G 59/62 (2006.01); C08L 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 59/621 (2013.01); C08G 8/28 (2013.01); C08G 10/04 (2013.01); C08G 14/04 (2013.01); C08L 63/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 63/00 + C08L 61/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0034349 A1 20000615; CA 2320303 A1 20000615; DE 69910354 D1 20030918; EP 1055690 A1 20001129; EP 1055690 A4 20010502; EP 1055690 B1 20030813; TW 541325 B 20030711; US 6320013 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-08-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-11-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-11-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-09-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030911

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE