Global Patent Index - EP 1055737 A1

EP 1055737 A1 2000-11-29 - Device for rotating cylindrical rods during a quenching operation

Title (en)

Device for rotating cylindrical rods during a quenching operation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Drehen von zylindrischen Stäben während eines Abschreckverfahrens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise en rotation de barres cylindriques pendant une opération de trempe

Publication

EP 1055737 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420113 A

Priority

EP 99420113 A

Abstract (en)

Device for rotating cylindrical bars during dipping, is made up principally of a series of rings (1), of appropriate diamete and axial displacement, into which the bar to be treated is introduced, supported during rotation before and after immersion in the dipping fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/63; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/63 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/63 (2013.01); C21D 9/0075 (2013.01); C21D 9/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055737 A1 20001129; EP 1055737 B1 20040414; DE 69916426 D1 20040519

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-10-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040725

2004-07-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916426 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030612

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI