Global Patent Index - EP 1055751 A2

EP 1055751 A2 2000-11-29 - Combing machine with several combing heads

Title (en)

Combing machine with several combing heads

Title (de)

Kämmmaschine mit mehreren Kämmköpfen

Title (fr)

Machine de peignage avec plusieurs têtes de peignage

Publication

EP 1055751 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110464 A

Priority

DE 19923576 A

Abstract (en)

The combing machine, with a number of combing heads, is followed by an inclined conveyor (2) to carry the band of slivers directly after the final combing head (1). A calender roller (24) is at the lower conveyor deflection roller (22). The upper deflection roller (23) of the inclined conveyor (2) is close to the plane of the take-in rollers of the sliver drawing unit (3). final rollers of the drawing unit (3) are close to and above the funnel (51) of the station (5) to lay the drawn sliver in cans. A common frame (6) supports the drawing unit (3), the sliver laying station (5) with the funnel and paired calender rollers (52) and the spiral coil laying wheel (54), and the upper deflection roller (23) of the inclined conveyor (2), as an integrated compo group. A web funnel (41) is at the final rollers of the drawing unit (3), with a station (4) to form the sliver, with a connecte guide tube for the sliver (93). A twisting jet, with a connected pressure line, opens into the guide tube with a control valve. web funnel (41) swings at the free end of a lever (44), mounted to the frame (6), between a working position (4) and a service position. In the working position (4), the web funnel (41) lies in front of the clamping gap at the exit rollers of the drawing (3) and the outlet opening of the guide tube at the funnel (51) of the sliver laying station (5). In the service position, the w funnel (41) is swung upwards and outwards from the final drawing rollers. Guides (30) are between the upper deflection roller (2 of the inclined conveyor (2) and the leading rollers of the drawing unit (3), to restrict the width of the band of slivers. A central drive is at the frame (6), with gearing stages through toothed or flat belts. The drive also has a transmission link to rotating plate to rotate the sliver can (55). A monitor is at the calender rollers (52) of the sliver laying station (5), to mea the sliver (93) thickness. A separate motor with a control unit drives the final drawing rollers of the drawing unit (3), and th components which are synchronized with them. The upper drawing rollers are loaded by membrane pistons for the required forces on them. The drawing unit (3) is angled downwards to the exit side, towards the funnel (51) of the sliver laying station (5). The u drawing rollers have a play of 0.5-3.0 mm. At least one defining suction channel is over each upper drawing roller, and all the suction channels lead to a common suction zone. An air guide plate is over each suction channel.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kämmmaschine mit mehreren Kämmköpfen (1), mit einem allen Kämmköpfen zugeordneten Streckwerk (3), mit einer Faserbandablegevorrichtung (5), die ein drehbares Schlauchrad oberhalb einer drehbaren Kanne (55) für das Speichern von Faserband hat, wobei die Einzelkopfbänder (9) eng nebeneinander als Faserbandschar (91) von der Tischebene dem Streckwerk (3) zugeführt und dort zu einem Vliesband (92) verstreckt werden und wobei das Vliesband (92) mittels Vliestrichter nahe dem Klemmspalt der Ausgangswalzen (33) des Streckwerks zu einem Faserband (93) zusammengefasst und über Führungsmittel dem Trichter der Faserbandablegevorrichtung zugeführt werden. Mit dem Ziel die Funktionssicherheit auch bei hohen Arbeitsgeschwindigkeiten zu gewährleisten und ein automatisches Einziehen des Faserbandes zu gewährleisten wird für das Fördern der Faserbandsschar (91) unmittelbar nach dem letzten Kämmkopf (1) ein angetriebener Steigförderer (2) mit Kalanderwalze (24) nahe einer unteren Führungswalze (22) vorgesehen. Die obere Führungswalze (23) des Steigförderers (2) befindet sich nahe und in der Ebene der Einzugswalzen (31) des Streckwerkes (3) und die Ausgangswalzen (33) des Streckwerkes (3) sind nahe und seitlich oberhalb des Trichters (51) der Faserbandablegevorrichtung (5) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/26; B65H 54/80; D01G 21/00; D01H 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2006.01); D01G 21/00 (2006.01); D01H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/005 (2013.01); D01G 19/26 (2013.01); D01G 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923576 A1 20001123; AT 272735 T 20040815; EP 1055751 A2 20001129; EP 1055751 A3 20010516; EP 1055751 B1 20040804

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160517

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007248

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *RIETER A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-11-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070926

2007-11-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050419

2007-11-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *RIETER A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-07-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-06-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-05-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-05-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040804

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-11-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041115

2004-11-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-11-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-11-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007248 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI