Global patent index - EP 1055755 A2

EP 1055755 A2 2000-11-29 - Adjusting device for cam parts of flat bed knitting machines

Title (en)

Adjusting device for cam parts of flat bed knitting machines

Title (de)

Verstellvorrichtung für Schlossteile von Flachstrickmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage pour les cames de métiers à tricoter rectilignes

Publication

EP 1055755 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107205 A

Priority

DE 19924333 A

Abstract (en)

The cams on the carriage of a flat bed knitting machine are adjusted by two stepping motors driving two pinions (93,95). One pinion (93) engages two racks (100,200) that move in opposite directions to adjust two cams for the needle sinkers. The other pi (95) moves a cam plate (300) with the other cam tracks (320,340,350,360).

Abstract (de)

Eine Verstellvorrichtung für Schlossteile von Flachstrickmaschinen mit zwei Schrittmotoren, wobei ein Abtriebsritzel (93) des ersten Schrittmotors gleichzeitig und gegensinnig auf zwei in Schlittenlaufrichtung verstellbare Steuerschieber (100, 200) einwirkt, die Steuerflächen von ersten Schlossteilen beaufschlagen, und wobei ein Abtriebsritzel (95) des zweiten Schrittmotors auf einen in Schlittenlaufrichtung verstellbaren Kurvenschieber (300) einwirkt, der mit Steuerkurven (320, 340, 350, 360) mindestens für zweite und dritte Schlossteile versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/36 (2006.01); D04B 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/36 (2013.01); D04B 15/82 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055755 A2 20001129; EP 1055755 A3 20010103; EP 1055755 B1 20040721; CN 1123659 C 20031008; CN 1275644 A 20001206; DE 19924333 A1 20001130; ES 2222865 T3 20050216; JP 2001020163 A 20010123; JP 3463210 B2 20031105; PT 1055755 E 20041231

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2222865

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007106

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT PT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI