Global Patent Index - EP 1055759 A1

EP 1055759 A1 2000-11-29 - Method and machine for the production of matting made from a natural fibre sheet

Title (en)

Method and machine for the production of matting made from a natural fibre sheet

Title (de)

Verfahren und Maschine zur Herstellung einer Matte aus einem Naturfaservlies

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine pour la production d'une bande d'un non-tissé de fibres naturelles

Publication

EP 1055759 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110062 A

Priority

EP 99110062 A

Abstract (en)

The fleeces (7, 8, 9) are continuously supplied together to one or more heaters (12, 13), passing them immediately afterward between pressing rollers (10, 11). An Independent claim is also included for the machine carrying out the process. Preferred features: Fleeces are withdrawn continuously from their storage rolls (1-6) for supply to the heater. Before bein rolled up, they are needled. The natural fiber fleece (8) contains low melting point thermoplastic fibers. The plastic fiber fle contains thermoplastic fibers of both low and high melting points. Heaters act on mutually-facing sides of the fleeces. By heati only at the surface, the low melting point thermoplastic fibers are melted. Hot air is employed for heating. Fleeces are supplie heating, edge-aligned. Mats are divided to predetermined width, by longitudinal cutters (29).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Matte aus einem Naturfaservlies, welches thermoplastische Fasern enthält, und mindestens einem weiteren Vlies aus Kunststofffasern vorgeschlagen, bei dem die Vliese gemeinsam einer oder mehreren Hitzequellen kontinuierlich zugeführt und unmittelbar an die Erhitzung anschließend zwischen Presswalzen hindurchgeführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/55 (2013.01); D04H 1/4266 (2013.01); D04H 1/544 (2013.01); D04H 1/559 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055759 A1 20001129; EP 1055759 B1 20030723; AT 245721 T 20030815

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *QUADRANT PLASTIC COMPOSITES A.G.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-12-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-10-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-10-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-10-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT RO SI

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: QUADRANT PLASTIC COMPOSITES AG

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19990522;RO PAYMENT 19990522;SI PAYMENT 19990522

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYMALIT AG

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 19990522;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990522;SI PAYMENT 19990522