Global Patent Index - EP 1055761 A1

EP 1055761 A1 2000-11-29 - Shuttle embroidery machine with support carriage

Title (en)

Shuttle embroidery machine with support carriage

Title (de)

Schiffchenstickmaschine mit einer Treiberbalkeneinheit

Title (fr)

Machine à broder à navette avec un attelage de support

Publication

EP 1055761 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810469 A

Priority

EP 99810469 A

Abstract (en)

The drive rail is made of a profiled section (11), e.g. an aluminum extrusion, and the drive pins (13,15) slide in holes (31 drilled in the section (11). The profile includes registers (39,40,41) for spring loaded location catches (35). The upper drive assembly (15,36, 57) is preferably made in one piece in plastic. The drive pins (13,15) are hollow for part of their length. An Independent claim is also included for remotely controlled operation of the lower drive pins, e.g. by a pneumatic actuat to bring the shuttle in and out of operation.

Abstract (de)

Die Schiffchenstickmaschine weist eine Treiberbalkeneinheit auf, deren Treiberbalken (11) aus einem gezogenen Profil, z.B. aus einer Aluminiumlegierung, besteht. Für jede Stickstelle ist ein unterer Treibernagel (13) und ein oberer Treibernagel (15) vorgesehen, die in Bohrungen (37,31) eingesetzt sind. Der obere Treibernagel (15) ist samt Rastfeder (35) und Betätigungslappen (57) einstückig z.B. aus Kunststoff geformt. In der eingeschobenen Stellung des Treibernagels (15) kann die Rastfeder (35) an einer Rille oder einer Rippe (39) einrasten. Auf dem unteren Treibernagel (13) kann nach dem Einsetzen in den Treiberbalken (11) wahlweise ein Aufsetzteil (63) oder ein Aufsetzteil (67) aufgeschnappt werden. Mit dem Aufsetzteil (63), das in die Rille (41) eingreift, wird der Treibernagel (13) blockiert. Mit dem Aufsetzteil (67) bleibt der Treibernagel (13) verschiebbar, kann aber mit den Federn (69), die in Rillen (40,41) eingreifen können, in zwei verschiedenen Stellungen gesichert werden. Ein von der Stickmaschine steuerbares Betätigungselement 73 dient der Betätigung des unteren Treibernagels (13). Der Treiberbalken ist sehr kostengünstig in der Herstellung und besitzt eine geringe Masse, die hohe Stickgeschwindigkeiten erlaubt. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055761 A1 20001129; EP 1055761 B1 20020116; AT 212080 T 20020215; DE 59900627 D1 20020221; KR 100627617 B1 20060925; KR 20000075413 A 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900627 20020221

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212080 T 20020215

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI