Global Patent Index - EP 1055767 A1

EP 1055767 A1 2000-11-29 - Method for cleaning the process air ducts in a laundry drier and a laundry drier using this method

Title (en)

Method for cleaning the process air ducts in a laundry drier and a laundry drier using this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen der Prozessluftführung eines Haushaltwäschetrockners sowie ein zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens eingerichteter Haushaltwäschetrockner

Title (fr)

Procédé pour nettoyer les conduits d'air d'un sèche-linge domestique ainsi qu'un sèche-linge utilisant ce procédé

Publication

EP 1055767 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108556 A

Priority

  • DE 19919911 A
  • DE 19943125 A

Abstract (en)

The section (2) is flooded during a cleaning phase when the fan (3) generating the air current is switched off. The section (2) is flooded with a liquid (18) which is removed at the end of the cleaning phase.

Abstract (de)

In einem Kondenshaushaltwäschetrockner können sich Flusen oder allgemein Verunreinigungen aus der Prozeßluft in der Prozeßluftführung ablagern. Um zumindest einen Abschnitt der Prozeßluftführung zu reinigen, wird dieser außerhalb der Trocknungsphase in einer Reinigungsphase bei ruhendem Prozeßluftstrom mit einer Flüssigkeit 18 befüllt, die nach einer bestimmten Einwirkzeit zusammen mit Verunreinigungen oder Flusen wieder entfernt wird. Ein erfindungsgemäßer Haushaltwäschetrockner kann ferner wenigstens eine Verschließeinrichtung 11 bis 15 aufweisen, mit der die Prozeßluftführung zumindest über einen Teil ihres Querschnitts im wesentlichen flüssigkeitsdicht abgeschlossen werden kann, um von der Prozeßluftführung wenigstens einen Teilabschnitt abzuteilen, der unter Einsatz einer geringeren Menge der Flüssigkeit 18 einzeln geflutet werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/24; D06F 58/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/22 (2006.01); D06F 58/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/24 (2013.01); D06F 58/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055767 A1 20001129; EP 1055767 B1 20030820; AT 247735 T 20030915

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070419

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERATE *BSH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-01-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003337 P 20030925

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI