Global patent index - EP 1055772 A1

EP 1055772 A1 2000-11-29 - Method for producing components for the mechanical processing of aqueous papermaking pulp

Title (en)

Method for producing components for the mechanical processing of aqueous papermaking pulp

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Garnituren für das mechanische Bearbeiten von wasserhaltigem Papierfaserstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication des garnitures pour le traitement méchanique de la pâte à papier aqueuse

Publication

EP 1055772 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106187 A

Priority

DE 19923865 A

Abstract (en)

To produce the clothing for grinders, to grind paper fiber suspensions, a body (3) of a hard material is shaped according to structure of the grinder, penetrated by a bonding agent (4) such as solder. The assembly gives a bond between the grinder and th base body (1). The body (3) of hard material is bonded to the base body (1) by the penetration of the bonding agent, after the bodies (1,3 have been fitted together. The grinder and the base body (1) are of different materials. The hard material body (3) and the bonding a (4) are bonded together at a temp. of at least 600 degrees C or at least 1000 degrees C. The body (3) of hard material can have grooves which extend to the base body (1). The bonding agent (4) is a metallic solder, applied in a layer on the hard material b (3) before penetration, where the shape of the layer matches the outline of the body (3). The outline shape of the hard material body (3) and the layer of bonding agent is formed before penetration, in a single-stage and common action. The bonding agent lay is also applied to any grooves in the body (3). The grooves are prepared to give no bond between the solder (4) and the base bod (1). The hard material body (3) is of hard particles in a granule size of 3-100 micrometers. The granules have edges or are roun on all sides. The granules are of a hard metal. The granules are embedded in a matrix of an easily-melted material which is remo before or during penetration, so that the free zones between the granules are wholly filled by the solder. The hard material bod (3) can be a porous pack, compressed and solidified by pressing. The grinder shape matches the dimensions and outline of the har material body (3). The grinder clothing is produced in a number of stages, where the clothing height is increased in steps at ri angles to the base body, using a number of hard material bodies (3) for the same section of the grinder. A number of hard materi bodies (3), in contact with each other, are bonded together through the penetration of the bonding agent. The grinder can be structured so that a number of lands are formed on the base body (1) as narrow bars at right angles to the base, with grooves between them. Or tooth projections can be formed on the base body. A base body (1) is used, already prepared with projections, w have the same outline shape as the grinder to be made. The base body (1) can be one which has already been used, and the clothin has been worn away.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient der Herstellung von Garnituren, welche insbesondere zum Mahlen von suspendiertem Papierfaserstoff geeignet sind. Solche Garnituren bauen sich auf aus einem Grundkörper (1) und dem eigentlichen Bearbeitungselement (2). Erfindungsgemäß wird zunächst ein Hartstoff-Körper (3) in einer Form, welche zumindest einem Teil des herzustellenden Bearbeitungselementes (2) entspricht, gebildet und mit einem Bindemittel (4), welches z.B. ein Lot ist, penetriert. Dadurch erfolgt auch die Verbindung von Bearbeitungselement (2) und Grundkörper (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 7/12 (2006.01); D21D 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055772 A1 20001129; EP 1055772 B1 20051207; AT 312229 T 20051215; BR 0002169 A 20010102; BR 0002169 B1 20101130; CA 2309310 A1 20001125; DE 19923865 A1 20001130; DE 50011792 D1 20060112; KR 20010049406 A 20010615; US 6443353 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120322

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011792

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 312229

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120322

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110404

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-11-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011792

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-01-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI FR GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI