Global Patent Index - EP 1055777 A2

EP 1055777 A2 2000-11-29 - Wide sleeper for level crossings and level crossing equipped with such

Title (en)

Wide sleeper for level crossings and level crossing equipped with such

Title (de)

Breitschwelle für Bahnübergänge sowie damit ausgerüsteter Bahnübergang

Title (fr)

Traverse large pour passage a niveau et passage a niveau correspondant

Publication

EP 1055777 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108483 A

Priority

DE 19924326 A

Abstract (en)

The sleepers are positioned on the track bed with narrow gaps permitting forming of bends. Each sleeper has a trapezoidal cr section, with sides extending at the same steep angle from the base (9) to the continuous mainly flat top surface (8). The centr foot has lowered support bases (17) on either side to accommodate filler blocks, and at the outer sleeper ends (15), it is exten upwards to the level of the central section (14). Each sleeper has short water channels (19) extending from the central section the sleeper end faces (18).

Abstract (de)

Breitschwelle für Bahnübergänge für eine Schienenfahrbahn mit in Schotter verlegten Schwellen mit einem überdeckenden, nur die Schienen und ihre Befestigungselemente aussparenden Straßenbelag, wobei die Breitschwellen nur mit einem kleinen, eine radiale Verlegung (Kurve) ermöglichenden Verlegespalt nebeneinander auf dem Schotterbett verlegt sind und sie im Querschnitt trapezförmig mit von der Unterseite bis zur Oberfläche im wesentlichen gleichmäßig steil verlaufenden Seitenflächen versehen sind und eine im wesentlichen durchgehende, im wesentlichen ebene Oberfläche aufweisen und dass an den äußeren Schwellenköpfen, der von seitlichen abgesenkten Auflagerbänken zum Einlegen von Füllsteinen mit einer der Absenkung entsprechenden Dicke flankierte Mittelfuß ebenfalls, vorzugsweise quaderförmig, bis auf die Höhe des Mittelbereichs hochgezogen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 3/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055777 A2 20001129; EP 1055777 A3 20030502; DE 19924326 C1 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050527

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

RO

- Payment date: 20030929

2004-01-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

SI

- Payment date: 20030929

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI