Global patent index - EP 1055778 A2

EP 1055778 A2 2000-11-29 - Device to ease the change movement and elastic locking of moveable rails or track parts

Title (en)

Device to ease the change movement and elastic locking of moveable rails or track parts

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Erleichtern der Umstellbewegung und zum elastischen Verriegeln von beweglichen Schienen oder Schienenteilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faciliter le changement et le verrouillage élastique des rails mobiles

Publication

EP 1055778 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890163 A

Priority

AT 94299 A

Abstract (en)

The tongue blades/rails (2) are supported during switching by rollers (18,19). The rollers are born on pivot levers (17) wit pivot shaft (16) located next to the end position of the switching movement. The lever is supported pivoted in direction of the underside of the rail foot, via a spring (21). The pivot shaft is located on a support (8) moveable in direction (15) of the switching movement of the tongue blade, and lockable.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum Erleichtern der Umstellbewegung und zum elastischen Verriegeln von beweglichen Schienen oder Schienenteilen, insbesondere von Zungenschienen (2), bei welchen die Schienen (2) während des Umstellvorganges über federnd gegen die Unterseite des Schienenfußes gedrückte Rollen (18,19) abgestützt sind und in wenigstens einer Endlage der Umstellbewegung federnd mit einer an der unteren Seitenkante oder der Seitenkante angreifenden Rolle (18,18') zusammenwirken. Die Rollen (18,19) sind an einem Schwenkhebel (17) gelagert, dessen Schwenkachse (16) der jeweiligen Endlage der Umstellbewegung benachbart ist, der Schwenkhebel (17) ist über wenigstens eine Feder (21) in Richtung der Unterseite des Schienenfußes schwenkbar abgestützt und die Schwenkachse (16) des Hebels (17) ist an einem Support (8) in Richtung (15) der Umstellbewegung des beweglichen Schienenteiles (2) verlagerbar und festlegbar angelenkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055778 A2 20001129; EP 1055778 A3 20030507; AT 410331 B 20030325; AT A94299 A 20020815

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051111

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: LT

- Payment date: 20000603

2004-01-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: LV

- Payment date: 20000603

2004-01-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: RO

- Payment date: 20000603

2004-01-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: SI

- Payment date: 20000603

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20000603;LV PAYMENT 20000603;MK;RO PAYMENT 20000603;SI PAYMENT 20000603