Global Patent Index - EP 1055788 A1

EP 1055788 A1 2000-11-29 - Flat key and cylinder lock

Title (en)

Flat key and cylinder lock

Title (de)

Flachschlüssel und Zylinderschloss

Title (fr)

Clé plate et serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 1055788 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101034 A

Priority

AT 93899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ295156B6] In the present invention, there is disclosed a flat key for a cylinder lock being provided on its face teeth with at least two director curves (32, 33, 34, 35) having control surfaces sensed at sensing point (36, 37) through the mediation of core pegs (5) of the cylinder lock. The director curves (32, 33 34, 35) are arranged immediately along the flat key (4) central longitudinal plane (13) and the flat key (4) can be optionally provided in the region of its back portion with longitudinal profiled grooves and/or ribs. The cylinder lock with a tumbler (1) and a cylindrical core (2) rotatably mounted therein (2) is provided with a key channel (3) for the flat key (4). On both sides of the key channel (3) there are arranged sliding core pegs (5) being controlled by the flat key (4), and a locking element (6) sensing a shifted position. The core pegs (5) are spring-loaded and are provided on their sides (10) turned away from the key channel (3) with at least one release groove (11) for engagement of sensing pins (12) of the locking elements (6).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Flachschlüssel für Zylinderschloß, wobei der Flachschlüssel wenigstens eine Steuerkurve mit Schlüssel-Steuerflächen aufweist, die von Kernstiften abtastbar sind, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Flachachlüssel einen durch wenigstens zwei Steuerkurven (linke (32,33) und rechte (34,35) Steuerkurve) gebildeten Schlüsselbart aufweist, die zu beiden Seiten unmittelbar entlang der Mittellängsebene des Schlüssels angeordnet sind und daß die Abtaststellen (36,37) zu beiden Seiten der Mittellängsebene zueinander versetzt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/00 (2006.01); E05B 19/10 (2006.01); E05B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 27/0082 (2013.01); E05B 19/0017 (2013.01); E05B 19/0052 (2013.01); E05B 27/0078 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7565 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7605 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7616 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7684 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7729 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7802 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7819 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7881 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7938 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7944 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29922815 U1 20000224; AT 394566 T 20080515; AT 409019 B 20020527; AT A93899 A 20010915; CH 693572 A5 20031015; CZ 295156 B6 20050615; CZ 9904706 A3 20010613; DE 50015140 D1 20080619; DK 1055788 T3 20080901; EP 1055788 A1 20001129; EP 1055788 B1 20080507; ES 2306639 T3 20081116; FR 2794159 A3 20001201; FR 2794159 B3 20010511; GB 0000836 D0 20000308; GB 2350398 A 20001129; GB 2350398 B 20030917; HK 1030646 A1 20040227; HR P20000060 A2 20001231; HR P20000060 B1 20081031; HU 222080 B1 20030428; HU 9904700 A2 20010528; HU 9904700 D0 20000328; IE S20000374 A2 20010207; NL 1014019 C1 20001128; NO 996370 A 20001127; NO 996370 D0 19991221; PT 1055788 E 20080819; SI 1055788 T1 20081031; SK 188599 A3 20010212; SK 284996 B6 20060406; TR 200001509 A2 20001221; TR 200001509 A3 20001221; US 6427506 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-10-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100121

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120120

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100121

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110411

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2011-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-10-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100830

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-07-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2009-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090210

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2306639 T3

2008-09-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080402030

2008-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-09-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-08-19 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080807

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015140 P 20080619

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2008-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030717

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010509

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI