Global Patent Index - EP 1055789 A1

EP 1055789 A1 2000-11-29 - Control device for locking a vehicle

Title (en)

Control device for locking a vehicle

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung zum Verschliessen eines Fahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de verrouillage d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1055789 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401414 A

Priority

FR 9906699 A

Abstract (en)

When the vehicle is locked, the external control unit (9) is adapted to return, in response to an action by the user, a control signal to the Electronic Control Unit (1), which, via an antennae (3), causes a first interrogation for verifying the presence or absence of the identified subject outside the vehicle, and if the presence of the identified subject is not detected by the external unit, the ECU causes a second interrogation to be caused via a second antennae (2) for verifying the presence or absence of the identified subject inside the vehicle. If again the subject is not identified inside the vehicle, the ECU sends a locking signal to the doors (6-8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00373 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/63 (2013.01); G07C 2209/65 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055789 A1 20001129; EP 1055789 B1 20041201; DE 60016310 D1 20050105; DE 60016310 T2 20051124; ES 2232393 T3 20050601; FR 2794086 A1 20001201; FR 2794086 B1 20010824

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232393 T3

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016310 P 20050105

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI