Global Patent Index - EP 1055792 A2

EP 1055792 A2 2000-11-29 - Driving device for a window

Title (en)

Driving device for a window

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für ein Fenster

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour une fenêtre

Publication

EP 1055792 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111373 A

Priority

  • DE 19924175 A
  • DE 19936580 A

Abstract (en)

A window with surround (2) and swivel frames (3) responds to drive (10) rod (11) using drive unit (20) of drive (10) fixed t frame (3) so its guide (21) allows for rod (11) movement. The unit (20) has an element working with the rod (11) so as to swing frame (3) along the rod. The element of drive unit (20) can be moved from drive setting (x) into setting (y) in which the elemen longer operatively engages the rod (11). The main drive (10) uses its adjuster (45) as actuated by the window controls in order move the drive element back from retract to active setting. The drive element is disengaged from drive (10) and only re-coupled drive unit (20) in response to a second movement of the window controls.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antriebsvorrichtung für ein Fenster, welches einen Blendrahmen (2) und einen Schwenkrahmen (3), der über ein Bedienorgan (5, 6) des Fensters (1) bewegbar ist, besitzt, wobei die Antriebsvorrichtung (10) eine fest mit dem Blendrahmen (2) und relativbeweglich zum Schwenkrahmen (3) angeordnete Betätigungsstange (11) aufweist, welche von einer Antriebseinrichtung (20) der Antriebsvorrichtung (10) angetrieben ist, wobei die Antriebseinheit (20) der Antriebsvorrichtung (10) am Schwenkrahmen (3) des Fensters (1) befestigt ist und ein Führungselement (21) aufweist, in dem die Betätigungsstange (11) verschiebbar gelagert ist, wobei die Antriebseinrichtung (20) ein mit der Betätigungsstange (11) kraft- oder formschlüssig zusammenwirkendes Antriebselement (22) aufweist, so daß durch eine entsprechende Antriebsbewegung des Antriebselements (22) eine Verschwenkbewegung des die Antriebseinheit (20) tragenden Schwenkrahmens (3) des Fensters (1) entlang der Betätigungsstange (11) bewirkbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, , daß das Antriebselement (22) durch eine durch das Schließen des Fensters bewirkte Auslösebewegung von seiner die Betätigungsstange (11) antreibenden Antriebsposition (x) in eine Position (y) bewegbar ist, in der das Antriebselement (22) nicht in einem antriebsfunktionellen Wirkeingriff mit der Betätigungsstange (11) ist, daß die Antriebsvorrichtung (10) ein vom Bedienorgan (5, 6) des Fensters (1) betätigbares Verstellelement (45) aufweist, so daß durch eine Betätigungsbewegung des Bedienorgans (5, 6) des Fensters (1) das Antriebselement (22) aus seiner zurückgezogenen Position (y) in seine Antriebsposition (x) bewegbar und das Antriebselement (22) der Antriebsvorrichtung (10) von seiner Antriebseinrichtung (20) entkoppelbar ist, und daß durch eine weitere Betätigungsbewegung des Bedienorgans (5, 6) des Fensters (1) das Antriebselement (22) wieder an die Antriebseinrichtung (20) ankoppelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12; E05F 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/12 (2006.01); E05F 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/619 (2013.01); E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/722 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055792 A2 20001129; EP 1055792 A3 20020717

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060516

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOMFY S.A.S.

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOEPPEL, KLAUS, DIPL.-ING.

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI