Global patent index - EP 1055793 A2

EP 1055793 A2 2000-11-29 - Device for protecting drawers enclosed in a safe or similar

Title (en)

Device for protecting drawers enclosed in a safe or similar

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Schutz von in einem Tresor o.dgl. eingesperrten Schubladen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la protection de tiroirs renfermés dans un coffre-fort ou similaire

Publication

EP 1055793 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00201677 A

Priority

IT TO990435 A

Abstract (en)

Extra protection for a strong box (1) that has in the normal way a blind door (2). The extra protection is a transverse bar that is hinged at one end and when closed can be locked at the other end. A second bar (12) integral with the first bar extends vertically to prevent access to any of the safety deposit drawers (4). An upper drawer (6) for collecting rejects such as cards, uncollected cash is not covered by the vertical bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05G 1/00; G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/46 (2006.01); E05G 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); E05G 1/026 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/00 (2013.01); E05B 65/467 (2013.01); G07D 11/0003 (2013.01); E05G 1/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055793 A2 20001129; EP 1055793 A3 20060208; IT 1308045 B1 20011129; IT TO990435 A1 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-11-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2006-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-02-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI