Global Patent Index - EP 1055794 A1

EP 1055794 A1 2000-11-29 - Window with wooden frame connected to a hood which protects its exposed parts

Title (en)

Window with wooden frame connected to a hood which protects its exposed parts

Title (de)

Fenster mit einem seine unverdeckten Teile schützenden Abdeckung verbundenen Holzrahmen

Title (fr)

Fenêtre dont le châssis en bois est associé à un capotage qui protège ses parties exposées

Publication

EP 1055794 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440164 A

Priority

FR 9906923 A

Abstract (en)

The window frame (40) is of timber, with exposed sections protected by metal, especially aluminium, or plastic capping (5) i the form of extrusions. The capping has a section which covers the exposed timber with an air gap and is shaped to create a ventilat effect. The air gap is also used to drain away water penetrating the timber frame or running off the glass (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E06B 1/34; E06B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/34 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/14 (2013.01); E06B 1/342 (2013.01); E06B 3/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055794 A1 20001129; FR 2794166 A1 20001201; FR 2794166 B1 20060804

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-12-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI