Global Patent Index - EP 1055808 A3

EP 1055808 A3 2000-12-20 - Motorcycle exhaust gas sensor assembly

Title (en)

Motorcycle exhaust gas sensor assembly

Title (de)

Anbringung eines Auspuffgassensors bei einem Motorrad

Title (fr)

Montage d'un détecteur de gaz d'échappement sur moto

Publication

EP 1055808 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108192 A

Priority

JP 14978999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1055808A2] The invention positions an exhaust gas sensor in such a manner that a protective cover is not required, collisions and water bursts due to flying stones are avoided as much as possible, where maintenance work is straightforward, and where available space is effectively utilized. To achieve this, an exhaust gas sensor 29 is fitted to an upper side wall of an exhaust pipe 26 at a position forward from a right projection 14a of a crank case 14 and facing out from a right side surface 15a of a cylinder block 15. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62J 99/00 (2009.01); B62M 7/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); G01N 27/409 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/008 (2013.01); F02D 41/1439 (2013.01); F02D 41/1456 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055808 A2 20001129; EP 1055808 A3 20001220; EP 1055808 B1 20030409; CN 1135294 C 20040121; CN 1277315 A 20001220; DE 60002002 D1 20030515; DE 60002002 T2 20031016; JP 2000335467 A 20001205; JP 4145423 B2 20080903; TW 510436 U 20021111

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120413

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60002002

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110406

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080413

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080413

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070402

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MOTORCYCLE WITH AN EXHAUST GAS SENSOR

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MOTORCYCLE WITH AN EXHAUST GAS SENSOR

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI