Global Patent Index - EP 1055813 A2

EP 1055813 A2 2000-11-29 - Liquid cooled combustion engine with an exhaust gas recirculation system

Title (en)

Liquid cooled combustion engine with an exhaust gas recirculation system

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Abgasrückführsystem

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion à refroidissement par liquide et avec un système de recirculation de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1055813 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109834 A

Priority

DE 19924398 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has an exhaust gas feedback heat exchanger (5) connected to the feed or return sides of a cooling medium circuit controlled by a thermostat for cooling the exhaust gas fed back into the induction air (7) via a valve (6). The heat exchanger i controlled on the feed or return side by a choke-thermostat (8). The heat exchanger is controlled to use exhaust gas heat. A fir branching device (10) downstream of the valve is connected to an engine exhaust gas line (11). A second branching device (14) to coolant circuit is arranged in the heat exchanger's feed or return line. The valve and the two branching devices are controlled a characteristic field to provide free passage for exhaust gas feedback.

Abstract (de)

Für eine flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Abgasrückführsystem, das einen zu- und abflußseitig mit einem Kühlmittelumlauf einer kennfeldgesteuerten Brennkraftmaschine verbundenen Wärmetauscher zur Kühlung des über ein AGR-Ventil gesteuert in die Maschinen-Ansaugluft rückgeführten Abgases umfaßt, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß der AGR-Wärmetauscher zur Nutzung von Abgaswärme zur schnellen Erwärmung des Kühlmittelumlaufes in der Warmlaufphase der Brennkraftmaschine gesteuert betreibbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/20 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F01P 7/14 (2006.01); F02B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/20 (2013.01); F02M 26/28 (2016.02); F02M 26/71 (2016.02); F01P 2007/143 (2013.01); F01P 2007/146 (2013.01); F01P 2060/02 (2013.01); F01P 2060/08 (2013.01); F02B 29/0406 (2013.01); F02B 29/0475 (2013.01); F02M 26/05 (2016.02); F02M 26/33 (2016.02); F02M 26/44 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055813 A2 20001129; EP 1055813 A3 20010711; EP 1055813 B1 20021120; DE 19924398 A1 20001130; ES 2187408 T3 20030616

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187408 T3

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000779 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 25/07 A, 7F 01P 3/20 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI