Global patent index - EP 1055819 A1

EP 1055819 A1 2000-11-29 - Hydraulic gear pump

Title (en)

Hydraulic gear pump

Title (de)

Hydraulische Zahnradpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe hydraulique à engrenage

Publication

EP 1055819 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401476 A

Priority

FR 9906801 A

Abstract (en)

The pump (1) consists of a housing (2) with suction (13) and pressure (14) channels, containing meshing driving and driven g (6, 8). At least one of the two gears is made from a material with vibration damping properties and a low friction coefficient, as a polymer or copolymer optionally modified with carbon filler and suitable for injection moulding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/08; F04C 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5865239 A 19990202 - CARR CHARLES F [US]
  • [XY] US 4583924 A 19860422 - ZENGLEIN WOLFGANG [DE], et al
  • [X] US 5163824 A 19921117 - KANTNER HAROLD H [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 256 (M - 179) 15 December 1982 (1982-12-15)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055819 A1 20001129; EP 1055819 B1 20071024; DE 60036833 D1 20071206; DE 60036833 T2 20080731; FR 2794188 A1 20001201; FR 2794188 B1 20010810

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60036833

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-12-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050307

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI