Global patent index - EP 1055821 A1

EP 1055821 A1 2000-11-29 - Scroll-type apparatus

Title (en)

Scroll-type apparatus

Title (de)

Spiralanlage

Title (fr)

Appareil à spirales

Publication

EP 1055821 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303947 A

Priority

GB 9912216 A

Abstract (en)

A pump of the scroll-type comprising a first scroll member having an end plate and extending outwardly therefrom an involute spiral wrap; a second scroll member having an end plate and extending outwardly therefrom an involute spiral wrap; the spiral wraps of the respective scroll members mating such that when said first scroll member orbits relative to the axis of the second scroll member the walls of the two involute wraps define crescent shape volumes which become smaller and smaller as they move from the periphery to the centre of the mating scroll members, in which the innermost end of the involute wrap of at least one scroll member is so shaped that as the orbiting scroll member translates its complete locus there is little or no space for any fluid to remain within the pump. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/0269 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0761971 A1 19970312 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]
  • [X] EP 0105684 A1 19840418 - SANDEN CORP [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 116 (M - 299)<1553> 30 May 1984 (1984-05-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 9 (M - 268)<1446> 14 January 1984 (1984-01-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055821 A1 20001129; GB 9912216 D0 19990728

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040728

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI