Global Patent Index - EP 1055823 A1

EP 1055823 A1 2000-11-29 - VANE TYPE VACUUM PUMP FOR AUTOMOBILES

Title (en)

VANE TYPE VACUUM PUMP FOR AUTOMOBILES

Title (de)

FLÜGELZELLEN VAKUUMPUMPE FÜR AUTOMOBILE

Title (fr)

POMPE A VIDE A AILETTES POUR AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1055823 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959196 A

Priority

JP 9805642 W

Abstract (en)

In order to provide a vehicular vane-type vacuum pump in which the weight can be reduced, no abnormal wearing between shafts occurs and in which the manufacturing cost is low, the present invention resides in a vehicular vane-type vacuum pump comprising a cylindrical housing having a suction port and a discharge port, a rotor eccentrically housed within the housing, a shaft for rotationally driving the rotor and a vane rotatable in a sliding contact with an inner circumferential surface of the housing, whereby a fluid is pumped from the suction port to the discharge port and characterized in that the shaft is provided at its outer circumference with a projection or a groove and the shaft and the rotor are integrally secured together. The rotor may be formed by aluminum die-casting, plastic molding or by metal sintering. The projection or the groove on the outer circumference of the shaft may be integrally formed during cold forging of the shaft or manufacturing of the shaft by sintering or by weld-attaching a metal plate-formed product on an outer circumference of the shaft. Also, the housing and the shaft may be made of the same kind of material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 25/02; F04C 18/344; F04C 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/08 (2006.01); F01C 21/10 (2006.01); F04C 18/344 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/106 (2013.01); F01C 21/08 (2013.01); F04C 18/3442 (2013.01); F04C 29/0078 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055823 A1 20001129; EP 1055823 A4 20040512; EP 1055823 B1 20080220; DE 69839159 D1 20080403; DE 69839159 T2 20090226; TW 414837 B 20001211; WO 0036303 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101214

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69839159

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101214

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081121

2008-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69839159 P 20080403

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-02-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-05-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 25/02 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 18/344 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 29/00 B

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB