Global Patent Index - EP 1055864 A2

EP 1055864 A2 2000-11-29 - Lighting unit for luminous column

Title (en)

Lighting unit for luminous column

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinheit für Leuchtsäule

Title (fr)

Elément de colonne lumineuse

Publication

EP 1055864 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00401478 A

Priority

FR 9906824 A

Abstract (en)

The column part has a generally cylindrical shape which lodges several conductors parallel to the axis of the cylinder and a printed circuit support for electro-luminescent diodes. The printed circuit (21) has a principal plane and two faces, it is: - orientated with its principal plane (F) parallel to the axis (X) of the cylinder and carries several electro-luminescent diodes (20) on each face (21a,21b); - in each part of the column is lodged a plaque (23,24) of conductor (25,26) supports for interconnection between neighboring parts of the column. Each being co-planar with the printed circuit (21). The internal surface of the cylinder is fitted with ribs (11) to diffuse the emitted light.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 2/00; F21V 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21K 99/00 (2010.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21S 8/00 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01); F21W 2111/04 (2013.01); F21Y 2107/90 (2016.08); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08); Y10S 362/80 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055864 A2 20001129; EP 1055864 A3 20001213; FR 2794217 A1 20001201; FR 2794217 B1 20010720; JP 2000353402 A 20001219; KR 20010014978 A 20010226; TW 467249 U 20011201; US 6382811 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060706

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERNARD, JACQUES

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI