Global Patent Index - EP 1055873 A2

EP 1055873 A2 2000-11-29 - Lamp

Title (en)

Lamp

Title (de)

Lampe

Title (fr)

Lampe

Publication

EP 1055873 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00201792 A

Priority

DE 19924355 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical lighting unit has a reflector (2) with a throat section (5) into which a light bulb (3) is located. The bulb into a sleeve (6) and a ring is inserted for retention. A retaining collar (4) fits over the assembly and this is formed with th internal features to secure it to the reflector.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Lampe (1) mit einem Reflektor (2) und einer Lichtquelle (3). Der Reflektor (2) besitzt zur Aufnahme der Lichtquelle (3) einen Reflektorhals (5), in den die jeweilige Lichtquelle (3) eingeführt und ggf. nach einer Justierung fixiert wird. Als Lichtquelle (3) können Glühlampen und insbesondere Gasentladungslampen verwendet werden. Bei bekannten Lampen wird die jeweils verwendete Lichtquelle (3) mittels eines Kitt am Reflektorhals (5) befestigt. Die Lichtquelle (3) wird in dem Reflektor (2) ausgerichtet, muss in der gewünschten Position gehalten werden und ist erst nach der langen Trockenzeit des Kitt fixiert. Um die Herstellung zu vereinfachen, ist gemäß der Erfindung eine Hülse (4) zur Befestigung am Reflektorhals (5) und zur Aufnahme der Lichtquelle (3) vorgesehen. Durch eine zusätzliche Hülse (4) kann auf überraschend einfache Weise eine mechanische Befestigung der Lichtquelle (3) am Reflektor (2) erreicht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 17/16 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2013.01); F21V 17/164 (2013.01); F21V 19/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055873 A2 20001129; EP 1055873 A3 20021016; CN 1275691 A 20001206; DE 19924355 A1 20001207; JP 2000353421 A 20001219; KR 20010014965 A 20010226; US 6471385 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071201

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 19/00 A, 7F 21V 17/16 B

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI