Global Patent Index - EP 1055878 A2

EP 1055878 A2 2000-11-29 - Glow plug and method for producing same

Title (en)

Glow plug and method for producing same

Title (de)

Glühkerze und Verfahren zum Herstellung derselben

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1055878 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110503 A

Priority

  • JP 14881099 A
  • JP 2000056057 A

Abstract (en)

In a glow plug 1, a resistor 4, 5 wound in a spiral shape is inserted into a hollow heater tube 3 while the winding axis M coincides with a longitudinal axis of the heater tube, and is held therein via an insulating powder 30, wherein the resistor 4, 5 is energized with a current to generate heat. A first point t1 and a second point t2 are determined on the resistor 4, 5 so that a spiral pitch P is defined between the both. A third point t3 is defined at a position on the resistor 4, 5 between the first point t1 and the second point t2 so that the third point t3 is distant from the first point t1 and near the second point t2 at half a length of the resistor 4, 5 between the first point t1 and the second point t2 along the resistor. The resistor 4, 5 is tilted relative to the winding axis M so that a distance Q between the third point t3 and the first point t1 measured in the direction of the winding axis M is 0.75 times the spiral pitch P or more wherein the distance Q is the maximum value relative to the spiral pitch (P) as the tube turns 180 degrees on the winding axis M. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01); F23Q 2007/004 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H09217933 A 19970819 - JIDOSHA KIKI CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055878 A2 20001129; EP 1055878 A3 20050302; EP 1055878 B1 20071003; DE 60036575 D1 20071115; DE 60036575 T2 20080626; JP 2001041452 A 20010213; JP 4092845 B2 20080528

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110517

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110517

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60036575

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-06-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036575 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060912

2005-11-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-10-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI