Global Patent Index - EP 1055881 A2

EP 1055881 A2 2000-11-29 - Hinging device for household appliance

Title (en)

Hinging device for household appliance

Title (de)

Hausgerät-Scharniervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de charnière pour un appareil ménager

Publication

EP 1055881 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111209 A

Priority

DE 19923996 A

Abstract (en)

The collision force of the two arrester faces (40,42) is damped down by a first damping element (46) on the door part (20) a second element (48) on the connecting rod (24) and placed at points which necessarily converge due to the excentric hinge axes (18,22) in to braking contact. The elements (46,48) act as friction brakes at their contact faces designed to slide along each o over the door movement angle up to the damping stage, and both elements are in spring form. One element forms a leaf spring fixe door part or rod spaced from the fixing point of the other respective element. The rod (24) hinge axis (22) lies above the hinge axis (18) of the door part.

Abstract (de)

Hausgerät-Scharniervorrichtung mit einem Dämpfungsmittel (46, 48) zur Dämpfung eines Zusammenpralls von Anschlagflächen (40, 42). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/02; E05F 1/12; E05F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/12 (2006.01); E05F 5/02 (2006.01); F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 5/02 (2013.01); E05F 1/1276 (2013.01); F24C 15/023 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/488 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055881 A2 20001129; EP 1055881 A3 20031001; DE 19923996 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI