Global Patent Index - EP 1055885 A2

EP 1055885 A2 2000-11-29 - Air conditioner

Title (en)

Air conditioner

Title (de)

Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1055885 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110895 A

Priority

JP 14523199 A

Abstract (en)

In order to stabilize room temperature by adjusting heating capability, intermittent operation of a compressor 1 is performed with operation time of compressor 1 temporarily made longer at a prescribed timing, so that determination as to whether outdoor heat exchanger 5 is frosted or not can be made with high accuracy. Therefore, idle defrosting operation is prevented and defrosting operation is performed without fail when necessary. Therefore, heating efficiency is improved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00; F25B 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01); F25B 47/02 (2006.01); F25B 49/02 (2006.01); F25B 13/00 (2006.01); F25D 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/022 (2013.01); F24F 11/0086 (2013.01); F25B 47/025 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0087 (2013.01); F25B 13/00 (2013.01); F25B 49/025 (2013.01); F25B 2600/0251 (2013.01); F25D 21/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055885 A2 20001129; EP 1055885 A3 20020403; EP 1055885 B1 20060329; AU 3634900 A 20001130; AU 768701 B2 20040108; CN 1135336 C 20040121; CN 1275698 A 20001206; DE 60026898 D1 20060518; DE 60026898 T2 20070315; ES 2259955 T3 20061101; JP 2000337682 A 20001208; JP 3609286 B2 20050112

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160523

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60026898

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2259955 T3

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60026898 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050316

2003-03-12 [16A] NEW DOCUMENTS DISCOVERED AFTER COMPLETION OF THE EP-SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI