Global patent index - EP 1055886 A2

EP 1055886 A2 2000-11-29 - Control device of air contitioning system

Title (en)

Control device of air contitioning system

Title (de)

Regelungseinrichtung für eine Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour un système de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1055886 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111291 A

Priority

JP 14447899 A

Abstract (en)

In an air conditioning system concurrently using an air conditioner and a blower, coolness feeling is provided by wind from the blower, so that a target temperature for cooling can be shifted to be higher. As a result, energy can be saved. The present invention provides a control device for the air conditioning system using the air conditioner and the blower, which has air-conditioner temperature setting means (3) for setting the target temperature of the air conditioner, blower wind quantity setting means (5) for setting the wind quantity of the blower, and target temperature shifting means (7). The target temperature shifting means (7) determines a shift amount of the target temperature based on the target temperature and the wind quantity of the blower, and shifts the target temperature to be the shift amount higher, when the air conditioner and the blower are concurrently operated in a cooling mode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00; G05D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/006 (2013.01); F24F 11/0012 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP S6029855 A 19850215 - FUJITSU LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055886 A2 20001129; EP 1055886 A3 20020515; EP 1055886 B1 20050302; EP 1055886 B8 20050817; ES 2238219 T3 20050901; JP 2000337679 A 20001208

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2013-10-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131029

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110525

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-02-10 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20050401372

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20111202

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2238219

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-08-10 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: CONTROL DEVICE OF AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM

2005-06-22 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: CONTROL DEVICE OF AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM.

2005-05-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20050401372

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI