Global Patent Index - EP 1055897 A1

EP 1055897 A1 2000-11-29 - Heat exchanger with improved fin-positioning

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with improved fin-positioning

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit verbesserter Positionierung von Rippen

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur muni de positionnement d'ailettes perfectionné

Publication

EP 1055897 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401350 A

Priority

FR 9906718 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger has a series of flat parallel fins (2a, 2b) with holes (21) for tubes and spacers (231, 232) to provide t required interval between adjacent fins. The spacers are in the form of projections made by punching holes through the fins, whi are of a suitable heat conducting material, e.g. aluminium. The fins also have louvred slits (221, 222) for enhanced interaction with the air flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/32 (2013.01); F28F 2240/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055897 A1 20001129; EP 1055897 B1 20040317; DE 60008963 D1 20040422; DE 60008963 T2 20040812; ES 2219276 T3 20041201; FR 2794226 A1 20001201; FR 2794226 B1 20010727

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219276 T3

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008963 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030109

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI