Global patent index - EP 1055931 A2

EP 1055931 A2 2000-11-29 - Circuit for testing the operation of at least one antenna

Title (en)

Circuit for testing the operation of at least one antenna

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Prüfen der Funktionsbereitschaft mindestens einer Antenne

Title (fr)

Circuit pour tester le fonctionnement d'au moins une antenne

Publication

EP 1055931 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110408 A

Priority

DE 19923729 A

Abstract (en)

A by-pass impedance (Z) forms a shunt circuit between the aerial (14) and ground (oo). A dc test supply (Us) injects a curre (Ic) into the by-pass circuit formed by aerial and by-pass impedance. A comparator (COM) compares the resultant test voltage (Uc with a reference voltage (UREF) to determine whether or not the aerial is serviceable

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schaltungsanordnung zum Prüfen der Funktionsbereitschaft von Antennen (14, 20) für ein Funktelefon ( 40). Die Antennen (14, 20) weisen jeweils einen Strahler auf, der mit einem Ende offen in den Raum ragt. Unabhängig von einem Signalstrom (IHF) fließen Prüfströme (IC1, IC2), über Antennenleitungen zu den Antennen (14, 20). An jedem Strahler ist zum Rückführen des separaten Prüfstroms (IC1, IC2) parallel zum HF-Pfad ein Nebenpfad angeschlossen, der eine Impedanz (R1, R2) aufweist. Spannungsauswerter (VE1, VE2) überwachen den Funktionszustand der Antennen (14, 20) durch Vergleichen der von den Prüfströmen (IC, IC1, IC2) bewirkten Prüfspannungen (UC1, UC2) an den Antennenanschlüssen (12, 22) mit einem Sollwert (UREF) und generieren entsprechende Indikationssignale (UO1, UO2), die Aufschluss über den Funktionszustand der Antennen geben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 27/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2013.01); H01Q 3/267 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923729 A1 20001123; EP 1055931 A2 20001129; EP 1055931 A3 20010801; US 6437577 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status

2008-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071203

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01R 27/06 A, 7G 01R 31/28 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI