Global patent index - EP 1056036 A2

EP 1056036 A2 2000-11-29 - Method for detecting luminescent marks

Title (en)

Method for detecting luminescent marks

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Detektion von Lumineszenzmarken

Title (fr)

Procédé de détection de marques luminescentes

Publication

EP 1056036 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106464 A

Priority

DE 19924257 A

Abstract (en)

The luminescent detection method involves using a scanner (11) that has a transmitter (13) which directs an electromagnetic (15) at a marker (19), in a monitoring region (23). The reflected wavelength beam emitted is directed to a receiver optical syst (29-35) that filters the signal before supplying the signal as an input to an optical detector (37). Independent claims are included for a detection device.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Detektion von Lumineszenzmarken, wobei elektromagnetische Sendestrahlung in einen Überwachungsbereich ausgesendet wird, wobei ferner elektromagnetische Remissionsstrahlung, die von einer im Überwachungsbereich befindlichen Lumineszenzmarke remittiert wird, empfangen wird, wobei ferner in Abhängigkeit von der empfangenen Remissionastrahlung ein Empfangssignal erzeugt wird, wobei ferner das Empfangssignal ausgewertet wird, und wobei die Sendestrahlung und die Remissionastrahlung unterschiedliche Wellenlängen besitzen. Für einen Detektionsvorgang werden mehrere Empfangssignale erzeugt, die mehreren voneinander verschiedenen Empfangswellenlängen entsprechen. Zur Feststellung des Vorhandenseins einer Lumineszenzmarke innerhalb des Überwachungsbereichs werden die mehreren Empfangssignale ausgewertet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/10; G06K 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056036 A2 20001129; EP 1056036 A3 20020724; DE 19924257 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020919

2003-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI