Global Patent Index - EP 1056039 A2

EP 1056039 A2 2000-11-29 - Transmitter and receiver

Title (en)

Transmitter and receiver

Title (de)

Sende- und Empfangseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'émission et de réception

Publication

EP 1056039 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107808 A

Priority

DE 19923634 A

Abstract (en)

The transmitter/receiver (2) circuit apparatus is coupled to a coil (1) and the circuit is also coupled to a control stage (6). The transmitter/receiver arrangement includes a transmitter power amplifier (10) and a receiver amplifier (20). A signal from a trigger circuit (27) activates a pulse width modulation stage (9) which provides a signal to the transmission power amplifier..A transponder within the vicinity of the coil responds, and data is transferred to comparator stages (21) for identification.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Sende- und Empfangseinrichtung, insbesondere für Identifikationssysteme, ist in unmittelbarer Nachbarschaft mindestens einer Spule eine Baugruppe angeordnet, die mindestens eine Sende-Endstufe und einen Empfangs-Verstärker enthält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 19/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/38 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 7/00 (2006.01); H01Q 7/08 (2006.01); H01Q 21/24 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/2225 (2013.01); G06K 19/0723 (2013.01); H01Q 7/005 (2013.01); H01Q 7/08 (2013.01); H01Q 21/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056039 A2 20001129; EP 1056039 A3 20020123; DE 19923634 A1 20001207; JP 2000353974 A 20001219; KR 20010007102 A 20010126

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI